Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Aviles-Medeiros, Tanya A., Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions115 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1421 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: December 20, 2013Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration RE Calculation of Interest and Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 14, 2011Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Order-Claim of Exemption Hearing) filed.
Date: October 27, 2011Notice - Other (Notice of Name and Address Change of Plaintiffs Counsel) filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: July 20, 2012Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2011-04-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033b(1)&(2)) filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: September 29, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: July 20, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.