Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Shedrick O Davis, Iii, against Onwuli, Okay J., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions178 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time318 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: December 13, 2010Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: July 26, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Brief Summary Of Case) filed.
Date: July 26, 2010Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: July 26, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2010-07-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Re Lost Original Contract and Waiver of Excess Interest) filed.
Date: 2010-07-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Re Interest Computation) filed.
Date: 2010-07-26T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: December 13, 2010Declaration - Other (Declaration Re Waiver Of Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: 2010-07-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.