Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Solis-Rodriguez, Omar, Pasillas, Brianna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by William E Thompson, against Does 1-20, Basquez, Dena Rene, represented by Randel J Quadros, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie M. Earl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management379 days |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2010 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions986 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1056 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-26T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-01-19T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Reassignment of Case) filed.
Date: 2010-08-12T00:00:00Declaration of Arbitrator Unavailability filed.
Date: 2011-08-29T00:00:00Qualification Statement filed.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2012-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation for Settlement; Order
Date: July 12, 2012Rejection of Arbitration Award and Request for Trial De Novo filed.
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 01, 2012Summons filed.
Date: 2010-01-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2010-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Request filed.
Date: 2011-02-02T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-08-25T00:00:00Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2011-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2012-01-20T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar heard on 03/23/2012 09:01:00 AM .
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: July 12, 2012Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-05-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.