We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department ,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department ,
against
Pitts, Gerald L. ,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
December 30, 2009
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Matter Type
General Employment
Case Cycle Time
3311 days
Plaintiffs
State Of California, Employment Development Department
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
State Of California, Employment Development Department
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Pitts, Gerald L.
Date
Type
Description
January 23, 2019
Docket Event
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Get Document
January 23, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
March 20, 2013
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
March 08, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
December 07, 2012
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
November 17, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
August 18, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
July 12, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Get Document
May 20, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Get Document
December 31, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.