Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tbf Financial Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Linda S Leong, against Wang, Kenneth, Does 1-Xx, Carquest Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Richard K. Sueyoshi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard K. Sueyoshi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time547 days |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-07-08T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 01, 2011Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: January 10, 2011Order to Appear for Examination
Date: January 20, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Re Interest Calculation) filed.
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2010-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Re CCP 1033 Notice) filed.
Date: 2010-03-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Issued Sac) Issued
Date: 2010-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: February 22, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2010-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.