Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hunter Douglas Fabrication, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harold B Glassberg, against Does 1-50, Fry, Allan, West Coast Floors, White, Sharon, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time627 days |
Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: June 02, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Fee) filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2010-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Interest) filed.
Date: 2010-03-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: 2010-08-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: June 30, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied (San Francisco) filed.
Date: 2011-04-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 09/07/2011 08:30:00 AM .
Date: September 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.