Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lyon Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by W Jeffrey Fulton, against Does 1-5, California Exceptional People Service Inc, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time697 days |
Stipulation Only - Other (Pre-Judgment) (for entry of judgment) filed.
Date: April 22, 2010Request for Dismissal - Collections
Date: June 23, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Settlement Agreement filed.
Date: June 23, 2010Judgment by Court on Stipulation
Date: June 23, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Stipulation Only - Entry of Judgment submitted by Lyon Financial Services Inc rejected on 04/07/2010 .
Date: 2010-04-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: August 26, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: November 28, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.