Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Munday, Graham, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dennis F Moss, against Tuesday Morning Management Company, Tuesday Morning Inc, Does 1-40, represented by Richard M. Kobdish, Andrea M Valdez, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions215 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time215 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice filed.
Date: May 18, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 29, 2010Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Notice - Other (Corrected notice of hrg) filed.
Date: May 20, 2010Notice - Other (of assciation of counsel) filed.
Date: May 18, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.