Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pardee Homes, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jerome R Satran, against Zoes 1 - 100, Roes 1-20, Roes 1 Through 50, North Market Center L.P. A California Limited Partnership, Granite Bay-Natomas Meadows Lp A Washington Limited Partnership, (total of 12) See All represented by Franklin T Watson, Nancy J Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G. Virga Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions665 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time741 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion for Order for Judicial Reference, 12/22/10, Dropped) filed.
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 27, 2011Answer filed.
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/22/2010 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Order Appointing a Judicial Referee) filed.
Date: 2010-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-18T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-06-24T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-03-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 27, 2011Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Minute Order After CMC) filed.
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2011-09-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-02-16T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (to Appoint A Judicial Referee) filed.
Date: 2010-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: October 20, 2011Notice of Pendency of Action filed.
Date: 2010-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2011-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-06-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: September 23, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.