Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blakely, Pamela K., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dennis F Moss, against Tuesday Morning Management Company, Tuesday Morning Inc, Does 1-40, represented by Andrea M Valdez, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions313 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time313 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: February 16, 2010Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 08, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2009Answer filed.
Date: February 05, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: April 12, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.