Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Singh, Sumeet, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name
Date: December 31, 2009Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER
Date: January 07, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Publication filed.
Date: February 10, 2010Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: June 01, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.