Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Keller, Timothy A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions242 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2694 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: May 11, 2017Request for Dismissal (The Unjust Enrichment Cause of Action as to all Parties) filed.
Date: August 30, 2010Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: April 11, 2011Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk''s Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-01-12T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-08-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: February 23, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 17, 2017Writ of Execution (Contra Costa) Issued
Date: July 23, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.