Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Azari, Teerdade, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against County Of Sacramento, Deuel Vocational Institute, Does 1-50, Fox, Michael D., Raab, Brian R., (total of 9) See All represented by David A Carrasco, Grant Lien, Jesse Manuel Rivera, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Laurie M. Earl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaurie M. Earl Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions110 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1071 days |
Demurrer filed.
Date: 2010-04-09T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2011-02-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) filed.
Date: 2011-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2010-04-09T00:00:00Statement - Other filed.
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-03T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-09-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Evidence in support of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Grant Lien in Support of Motion For Protective Order) filed.
Date: 2010-12-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2010-04-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: 2011-03-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/04/2011 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2011-01-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-02-01T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: December 06, 2012Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00Opposition (To State Defendants Demurrer To First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-02-28T00:00:00Notice - Other (amended notice of demurrer) filed.
Date: 2010-08-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/28/2012 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation for Settlement; Order
Date: April 02, 2012Response (to Complaint and Other Relief) filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2011-02-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) submitted by Azari, Teerdade rejected on 01/10/2011 .
Date: 2011-01-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/29/2012 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 07, 2012Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-10-26T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2010-04-09T00:00:00Order Remanding Case to Originating Court filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd) filed.
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Notice - Other (Stipulation and Order of Parties to Remand Case Back to State Court) filed.
Date: 2010-08-20T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Declaration of Due Diligence filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-05-10T00:00:00Default denied as to Raab, Brian R on Complaint .
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-04-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-04-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.
Date: 2010-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-04-07T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Remand to Superior Court) filed.
Date: 2010-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2010-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-04-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2011-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Lien filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (amended) filed.
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Plaintiff's Attendance At Deposition) filed.
Date: 2012-01-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Attendance at Deposition) filed.
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: 2012-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: September 20, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.