Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Kem, Mealyvattey, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Brian R. Van Camp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian R. Van Camp Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time928 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 16, 2012Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (dismissal not entered as requested) filed.
Date: September 27, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: June 09, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-01-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: June 09, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.