Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Farmers Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Susan M Benson, against Dutras, James, Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time231 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: July 02, 2009Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 18, 2010Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: December 29, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-07-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: September 15, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2009-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.