Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Regent Arco #2, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Peter Ajlouny, Victoria L.H. Booke, against Sunrise Auto Sales & Leasing Inc, Does 1-50, Chawi, Salma Haddad, Chawi, Johnny, Abasi, Soleiman, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time1228 days |
Amended Complaint (Second) submitted by Regent Arco #2 rejected on 02/28/2012 .
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (for leave of court to file second amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed.
Date: 2012-02-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-11-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Peter Ajlouny in Support) filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 03/24/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-03-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of P Ajlouny in support) filed.
Date: 2011-08-12T00:00:00Stipulation (To Void Transfer Ab Initio) filed.
Date: June 25, 2012Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Support Of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-11-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of P Ajlouny in support) filed.
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (of demurrer to complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Peter Ajlouny In Support Of Ex Parte Application) filed.
Date: 2011-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-11-02T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2011-10-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause
Date: 2012-06-18T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend filed.
Date: 2011-06-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/24/2011 09:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 08/02/2011 09:00:00 AM published .
Date: 2011-07-29T00:00:00Motion - Other (amended) filed.
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion filed.
Date: 2011-03-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 08/02/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-08-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Peter Ajlouny In Support Of Motion) filed.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-04-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Support Of Motion) filed.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Motion - Other (for leave of court to file second amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-09-14T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex parte Application
Date: 2010-08-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities submitted by Regent Arco #2 rejected on 11/09/2009 .
Date: 2009-11-09T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2012-01-25T00:00:00Answer (first amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-12-15T00:00:00Reply - Other (to plaintiff's opposition) submitted by Chawi, Johnny rejected on 11/17/2009 .
Date: 2009-11-18T00:00:00Order - Other (Based on Factual Stipulation to Void Transfer Ab Initio) filed.
Date: June 25, 2012Demurrer filed.
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00Order - Other filed.
Date: 2010-08-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2009-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-04-28T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-04-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for All Proceedings Stayed heard on 08/24/2009 10:02:20 AM .
Date: 2009-08-24T00:00:00Notice - Other (of hearing on demurrer to first amended complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: 2009-08-21T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy (Stay of Proceedings)
Date: 2009-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action filed.
Date: 2010-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address and Telephone filed.
Date: 2010-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2010-06-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-04-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (For Stipulated Order To Continue Settlement Conference) filed.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2010-08-13T00:00:00Motion - Other (To Continue Settlement Conference And Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2010-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-08-25T00:00:00Motion - Other (To Continue Settlement Conference And Trial Date) filed.
Date: 2011-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Termination or Modification of Stay (CM-181) filed.
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-06-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2011-07-21T00:00:00Request - Other (Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: 2011-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-10-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2012-03-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2012-04-03T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-06-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Long Cause Court Trial - Civil Trial heard on 06/25/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-06-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.