State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Coger, Tiffany L.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Coger, Tiffany L.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Coger, Tiffany L.
Date
Type
Description
January 22, 2013
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
August 10, 2011
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
February 04, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
December 01, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .