State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Navarro, Jose,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Navarro, Jose
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Navarro, Jose
Date
Type
Description
September 21, 2016
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
January 21, 2011
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
January 04, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
September 01, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Judgment entered .
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .