Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Solis, Humberto I., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time3682 days |
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: November 21, 2009Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: August 29, 2018Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2009-03-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 31, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: December 02, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 04, 2011Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: July 09, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.