State Of California, Employment Development Department,
filed a(n)
General Employment -
Labor and Employment
case
represented by
State Of California, Employment Development Department,
against
Sanchez, Christian N.,
in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
This case was filed in
Sacramento County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Sanchez, Christian N.
Case Events for
State Of California, Employment Development Department v. Sanchez, Christian N.
Date
Type
Description
October 18, 2011
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
June 17, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
February 01, 2011
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
August 11, 2010
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
May 14, 2010
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
June 24, 2009
Docket Event
Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed.
September 30, 2008
Docket Event
Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment .