Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of California, Employment Development Department, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Molina, Trinidad, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time2466 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: July 02, 2015Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Writ of Execution and Memorandum of Cost - EDD filed.
Date: December 30, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 24, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: December 07, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.