Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stelios A Harris, against Alarid, Kenneth, Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1666 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: December 09, 2009Declaration - Other (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(d)) filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF ERICA L. BRACHFELD RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST & WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES) filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: March 27, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: March 07, 2011Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: July 24, 2013Declaration - Other (OR ERICA L. BRACHFELD PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 b (1) & (2)) filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: February 28, 2011Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: December 09, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.