Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ann K Merrill, Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1-10, Starkey, Larry O., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with James P. Arguelles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Arguelles Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions168 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2835 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-06-17T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-06-17T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-06-17T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (pre 8/17/09 filing fee) (Issued) filed.
Date: July 20, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-04-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-04-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-06-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Solano) Issued
Date: February 22, 2016Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 17, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: October 05, 2016Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: February 22, 2016Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 20, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.