Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Does 1-10, Jacques, Rene M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time636 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 23, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 24, 2009Declaration - Other filed.
Date: May 11, 2009Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: July 01, 2009Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: May 11, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.