Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Ii Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rory W Clark, against Does 1-10, Martinez, Cecelia, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions276 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3712 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: October 01, 2009Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rory W. Clark RE: Interest Computation) filed.
Date: October 01, 2009Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: May 13, 2010Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: December 30, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-04-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rory W. Clark Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 1033) filed.
Date: October 01, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-04-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-10-01T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-10-01T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Request - Other (Request for substitution of Attorney) submitted by Worldwide Asset Purchasing II LLC rejected on 02/27/2019 . | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Clark, Rory W added as a effective 12/30/2010 . | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued | |
January 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
January 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rory W. Clark RE: Interest Computation) filed. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rory W. Clark Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 1033) filed. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Martinez, Cecelia on Complaint . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.