Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Does 1-5, Winn, Chauncey, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert C. Hight Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions190 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time496 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: February 23, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: March 18, 2009Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: July 09, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: May 11, 2010Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: July 09, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Court - Default filed.
Date: February 23, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.