Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Bruce, Karl C., Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThadd A. Blizzard Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions520 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 14, 2020Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: 2009-06-01T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2010-06-04T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 14, 2020Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 29, 2015Writ of Execution Issued
Date: April 20, 2012Writ of Execution Issued
Date: February 06, 2013Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.