Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Autery, Rhonda M., Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time415 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: September 16, 2009Declaration - Other (in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585(d)) filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Erica L Brachfeld Re: Calculation of Interest & Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-03-02T00:00:00Default denied as to Autery, Rhonda M on Complaint .
Date: March 25, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 17, 2010Declaration - Other (of Erica L Brachfeld Pursuant to CCP 1033 b (1) & (2)) filed.
Date: 2009-03-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: April 14, 2009Judgment by Court by Default
Date: September 16, 2009Declaration - Other (of Erica L Brachfeld Pursuant to CCP 1033 b (1) & (2)) filed.
Date: April 14, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.