Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Romero, Crystal Marie, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Petition for Change of Name filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 02/18/2009 09:30:00 AM .
Date: February 18, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Order RE: Fee Waiver Hearing
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Proof of Publication filed.
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00FEE WAIVER ORDER-GRANTED
Date: February 18, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.