Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bre Properties, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert Scott Kennard, against Crain, Bruce, Crain, Celia, Does 1-10, Susoeff, Tatiana, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Kevin R. Culhane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin R. Culhane Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time664 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 09, 2010Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 15, 2010Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: June 12, 2009Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-01-12T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Bre Properties rejected on 05/20/2009 .
Date: June 01, 2009Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Default filed.
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Resident Ledger) filed.
Date: 2009-04-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2009-04-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: June 15, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 26, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.