Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dunn, Miasia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Edward A Smith, against Roes 1-20, Hoffmandavies, Elizabeth Anne, Does 1-50, Bernasconi, Mark Patrick, represented by Ann Marie Defelice, Tiza S Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Roland L. Candee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoland L. Candee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Order of Dismissal
Date: May 29, 2009Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2009-02-26T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-02-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: June 01, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.