Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mannerino, Todd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kenneth R Stone, against Murphy, Michael, Does 1 - 100, Adr Consulting Inc, represented by David H Bartholomew, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions474 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time478 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Exparte Application
Date: 2009-12-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-02-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2009-12-22T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: April 20, 2010Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: April 19, 2010Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2010-04-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2009-12-21T00:00:00Returned Document (Answer)
Date: 2009-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-13T00:00:00Notice to Appear for Reconsideration of Fee Waiver (of trial and mandatory settlement conference) filed.
Date: 2009-08-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kenneth R Stone) filed.
Date: 2009-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial filed.
Date: 2009-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2009-12-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.