Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Laguna Oaks Shopping Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kevin M Dollison, against Tran, Dat Bat, Does 1-50, Chung, Betty Phoi, Bcdt Inc, represented by W Austin Cooper, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time224 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: July 23, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: March 11, 2009Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: July 23, 2009Minutes finalized for heard on 04/07/2009 03:22:26 PM .
Date: April 07, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2009-02-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: April 02, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.