Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pantoja, Rene C., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Walter T Wroten, against Does 1-30, Fernandez, Cezar, represented by Mark R Harris, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions470 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time470 days |
Answer filed.
Date: 2009-04-03T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Response (Plaintiff's Reponses to Order to Show Cause) filed.
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2009-10-28T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2009-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00Attorneys Compliance Statement filed.
Date: 2010-01-29T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-03-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: April 15, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.