Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Flint C Zide, against Does 1-10, Fisher, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions329 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3526 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions filed.
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/11/2009 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-09-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2009-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 18, 2011Declaration - Other (of Walsh in support of Plaintiff's mtn to compel) filed.
Date: 2009-05-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2009-08-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-05-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Fee Waiver - Order re Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed.
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed.
Date: 2009-05-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Mark Walsh) filed.
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00Attachment - Other (Supplemental Declaration) filed.
Date: 2009-08-13T00:00:00Returned Document Form - [Re: Judgment, Dismissal, Declaration].
Date: 2010-01-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Supporting a clerk judgment) filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Supporting clerk entry of statutory attorney fees) filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-11-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Supplemental declaration CCP 585(a)(d)) filed.
Date: 2011-03-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Non-Military Status) filed.
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration - Other (of Non-Military Status) filed.
Date: April 02, 2015Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: April 02, 2015Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: August 27, 2018Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: February 13, 2018Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: November 01, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.