Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Goodman, Karen M., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Summer D Haro, against House, Diane, Does 1-50, Berrigan, Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time589 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-12-29T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-02-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Default denied as to House, Diane on Complaint .
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00Bankruptcy - Notice of Filing filed.
Date: 2009-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-04-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: April 22, 2010Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed.
Date: August 10, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.