Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Wilmer Amina Carter, In Her Capacity As The Assembly Member Representing The 62Nd Assembly District, William W. Manning, In His Capacity As The Assembly Member Representing The 27Th Assemby District, Wesley Chesbro, In His Capacity As The Assembly Member Representing The 1St Assembly District, Warren T. Furutani, In His Capacity As The Assembly Member Representing The 55Th Assembly District, Van Tran, In His Capacity As The Assembly Member Representing The 68Th Assembly District, (total of 51) See All represented by Michael P Beaver, Hiren Patel, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time278 days |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed.
Date: 2009-06-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00Continuance Request - Granted
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00Objection (Objection to the Court's Consideration of Defendant's Reply) filed.
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Response to the Compaint (Granted)
Date: 2009-01-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: August 11, 2009Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-07T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Of Order) filed.
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Reply - Other (memorandum of P&A's in support of motion to quash summons) filed.
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00Reply - Other (memorandum of P&A's in support of demurrer to complaint) filed.
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion for JOP) filed.
Date: 2009-06-04T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Order Re: JOP) filed.
Date: August 10, 2009Request for Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2009-06-04T00:00:00Objection (to Courts Consideration of Defendant's Reply to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00Response filed.
Date: 2009-07-15T00:00:00Judgment
Date: August 07, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed.
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in opposition to motion to quash service of summons) filed.
Date: 2009-03-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Vacating Entry of Default Against Defendant State Controller John Chiang
Date: 2009-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: August 07, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.