Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pinnacle Credit Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert J Colclough, Iii, against Does 1-10, Kang, Kour, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 05, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 05, 2019Application - Other filed.
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Affidavit - Other (of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-04-15T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2009-01-14T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: March 05, 2019Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: April 02, 2019Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: June 24, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 23, 2013Writ of Execution (LA) Issued
Date: June 11, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.