Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Asset Purchasing Ii, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Wood, Rebecca, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: June 24, 2009Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Returned Document Form - Re: Request for Default & Clerk's Judgment
Date: September 16, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: June 24, 2009Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2009-06-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-06-24T00:00:00Affidavit - Other (of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 12, 2010Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 12, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.