Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gordon, Linda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Charles H Ervin, against Shults, David, Does 1-60, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time301 days |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: October 28, 2009Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-08-05T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice - Other (of Commencement of Action by Employee Against Third Party) filed.
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Lien submitted by Cypress Insurance Company rejected on 08/21/2009 .
Date: August 24, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.