Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hallie N Zimmerman, against Does 1-10, Haakenson, Aaron D., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions232 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3878 days |
Declaration - Other (Exhibits in support of judgment) filed.
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: June 10, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: June 10, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-06-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Re Computation of Interest) filed.
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Compliance with CCP Section 1033b) filed.
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2010-10-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-10-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-10-29T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-06-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: October 20, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 18, 2013Writ of Execution (Alameda) Issued
Date: January 17, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 02, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: August 13, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.