Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jerome M Yalon, Jr, against Larkin, Shawn, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan G. Perkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions135 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time143 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: May 14, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Compliance with CCP Section 1033) filed.
Date: May 14, 2009Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: May 14, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: January 06, 2009Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: May 14, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
May 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Compliance with CCP Section 1033) filed. | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. | |
May 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Larkin, Shawn on Complaint . | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 45 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.