Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beneficial California Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Peter R Osterman, against Does 1-10, Cooper, Steven B., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3717 days |
Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: September 22, 2014Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 05, 2019Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 05, 2019Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-05T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2009-05-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2010-10-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: November 02, 2016Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 11, 2017Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: March 05, 2019Writ of Execution (SAN JOAQUIN) Issued
Date: November 02, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.