Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pinnacle Credit Services Assignee, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Robert J Colclough, Iii, against Does 1-100, Mckay, Nancy A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions413 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2013-01-02T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: July 19, 2019Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: July 19, 2019Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Erica L.Brachfeld Pursuant TO C.C.P. 1033b(1)&(2)) filed.
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2010-01-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment (Issued) Issued
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2010-08-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2013-01-02T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2013-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2014-07-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Non Military) filed.
Date: 2014-07-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: June 28, 2019Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: November 20, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: September 12, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 08, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.