Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Diab-Sharkiah, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by George P Eshoo, against James, Lyndia, Does 1-50, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions167 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time322 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: September 02, 2009Request for Court Judgment submitted by Diab-Sharkiah rejected on 08/27/2009 .
Date: August 31, 2009Request for Court Judgment filed.
Date: June 18, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: May 12, 2009Default denied as to James, Lyndia on Complaint .
Date: 2009-05-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-05-01T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.