Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gcfs Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Burke H Nelson, against Ungureanu, Emanuel C., Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Brian R. Van Camp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian R. Van Camp Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time558 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: June 07, 2010Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF ACCRUED INTEREST) filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-01-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 21, 2009Writ of Execution (pre 8/17/09 filing fee) (Sacramento) filed.
Date: September 10, 2009Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: September 21, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 01, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.