Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Steven S Loeb, against Does 1-10, Calton, Annetta Y., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThadd A. Blizzard Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions181 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2974 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: January 17, 2017Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: January 17, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 18, 2012Writ of Execution (pre 8/17/09 filing fee) (Los Angeles) filed.
Date: September 18, 2009Abstract of Judgment (pre 8/17/09 filing fee) filed.
Date: September 18, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.