Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Walker, Paula, Walker, Roscoe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gregory C Cattermole, against Bob Evan'S Farms Inc, Does 1-50, Lopez, Rueben, Swh Corporation, represented by William A Jenkins, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Michael G. Virga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael G. Virga Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions652 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time699 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-02-02T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (motion to compel responses to inspection demands) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Use of Private Alternative Dispute Resolution filed.
Date: 2010-03-08T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (to motion to compel special interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Reply - Other (memorandum in support of motion to compel and/or for sanctions) filed.
Date: 2010-06-24T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (motion to compel responses to request for specific damages) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-01T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulation and Order to Mediation - GRANTED) filed.
Date: 2010-03-11T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (motion to compel responses to form interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00Opposition filed.
Date: 2010-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-09-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of G C Cattermole in support) filed.
Date: 2010-06-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: September 09, 2010Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (form interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2009-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (inspection demand) filed.
Date: 2009-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (special interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2009-06-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.
Date: 2009-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (request for specification of damages) filed.
Date: 2009-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-12-02T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2010-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Date: 2010-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (deposition of plaintiffs) filed.
Date: 2010-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: 2010-06-30T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion to Compel Deposition, 7/1/10, Dropped) filed.
Date: July 06, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.