Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Atlantic Credit & Finance Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by George L Cohn, against Dossman, Tracy A., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions226 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time919 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Car4dmember Agreement) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Evidence Code Section 1551) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Interest Calculations) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Attorneys Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033(b)) filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 09, 2010Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-07-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 20, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 03, 2011Writ of Execution Issued
Date: November 17, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 03, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.