Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against West, Catherine B., Does 1 - 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2134 days |
Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2009-04-16T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-13T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Default denied as to West, Catherine B on Complaint .
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00Default denied as to West, Catherine B on Complaint .
Date: 2009-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of Statement of Venue - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-04-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 23, 2010Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: September 30, 2014Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed.
Date: March 04, 2011Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-13T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 26, 2013Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: April 01, 2010Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-05-14T00:00:00Default denied as to West, Catherine B on Complaint .
Date: 2009-05-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.